MS HR80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Recognizing The Extraordinary Service Of Major Latasha Mccullar And Commending Her Upon Establishing The Josten J. Day Foundation.
Title
Major Latasha McCullar; commend for establishing the Josten J. Day Foundation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |