MS HR71 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Honoring And Commending Mr. L.c. Gladney For His Extraordinary Service To The United States In World War Ii, And Many Contributions To His Community.
Title
L.C. Gladney; commend extraordinary service in World War II and many contributions to his community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred To Rules |