MS HR64 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Ridgeland High School Lady Titans Soccer Team And Head Coach Craig Winship For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a State Championship And For Winning Their Eighth Championship Soccer Title In Ten Years.
Title
Ridgeland Lady Titans; commend on winning eighth state soccer title.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Kimberly Campbell [D] | Rep. Mary Coleman [D] | Rep. William Denny [R] |
Rep. Rita Martinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Referred To Rules |