MS HR62 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Hartfield Academy Hawks Football Team And Head Coach Craig Bowman For Winning The Midsouth Association Of Independent Schools (mais) Class Aaaaaa State Football Championship.
Title
Hartfield Academy Hawks Football Team; commend upon winning MAIS AAAAAA State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |