MS HR3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Andre Keith Griffin And Expressing Deepest Sympathy Upon His Passing.
Title
Andre Keith Griffin; commend the life upon the passing of.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-09 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-09 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred To Rules |