MS HR116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Greg Chambers For Receiving A Patent For An Exceptional New Device For Feeding Livestock.
Title
Mr. Greg Chambers; commend upon receiving patent for new livestock feeding device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred To Rules |