MS HC98 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The Life And Mourning The Loss Of Mrs. Doris Mccool Osborne And Expressing Deep Sympathy To Her Family Upon Her Passing.
Title
Doris McCool Osborne; commemorate life and mourn loss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Rules |