MS HB980 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section Within Article 3, Chapter 29, Title 41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide An Automatic Defense To Prosecution For Any Charge That Is Brought Within Two Years Of A Federal Declassification Of A Controlled Substance That Is The Subject Of The Offense; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; provide automatic defense to prosecution for charge that is brought within two years of a federal declassification of.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Allow Governor's Veto to Stand |
2022-03-17 | House | Veto Referred To Judiciary B |
2022-03-17 | Vetoed | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |