MS HB961 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize And Provide For The Regulation Of The Use Of Personal Delivery Devices In Pedestrian Areas; To Amend Sections 17-17-403, 21-37-3, 27-19-3, 27-51-5, 63-3-103, 63-15-3, 63-17-55, 63-17-155, 63-19-3 And 63-21-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Personal delivery devices; provide for the regulation of the use of in pedestrian areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 37 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 51 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 17 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 17 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 21 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |