MS HB844 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi State Parole Board To Solicit Recommendations From Certain Individuals Before A Parole Hearing Whenever Such Hearing Is For Any Offender Who Has Been Convicted Of Certain Crimes Of Violence; To Require The Mississippi State Parole Board To Notify Certain Individuals Within A Set Period Of Time Before A Parole Hearing; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Parole Board; require to solicit recommendations from and provide notification to certain individuals before parole hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-22 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Sparks,Barrett |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Horan,Rushing |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred To Corrections |