MS HB842 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round Of Fire Trucks For Counties And Municipalities Under The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; To Create A Special Fund To Be Designated The "rural Fire Truck Matching Assistance Fund" Which Shall Be Used To Assist Counties And Municipalities With Remaining Eligibility Under The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Program; To Provide That The Total Amount Of Matching Assistance Shall Not Exceed 80% Of The Purchase Price Of The Rural Fire Truck; To Provide That The Department Of Insurance May Provide Such Matching Assistance To Counties And Municipalities Upon Meeting Certain Criteria; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; authorize two additional rounds for counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Michel,Hill |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Carpenter,Massengill |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |