MS HB823 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The Commission On Education And Economic Competitiveness To Develop A Vision For Mississippi's Future Economy And Consider How To Reform Education To Prepare All Students For That Future; To Develop Initial Legislative Recommendations For The 2024 Legislative Session; To Develop Omnibus Legislation To Introduce During The 2025 Legislative Session; To Establish Collaborative Partnerships Between Mississippi's Early Childhood, K-12, Higher Education And Workforce Development Systems Into A World-class System That Prepares All Students For Success In Work And Life By Addressing Career And Technical Education, Curriculum And Assessment, Foundations Of Support, And Governance And Accountability To Support This System; To Develop A Plan For Implementation Of The Proposed Omnibus Legislation; To Appropriate Funding To Procure The Selection Of A Nationally Recognized Organization With Expertise In International Education Benchmarking, Facilitation, And Leadership Development And Extensive Experience With Mississippi's Education System To Facilitate The Commission's Meetings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commission on Education and Economic Competitiveness; establish to develop vision for the state's future economic and educational success.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed |
2023-02-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |