MS HB761 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 35-1-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers And Duties Of The State Veterans Board In Relation To Operating The State Veterans Homes; To Authorize The Board To Establish Programs Relating To Employee Hiring And Incentives And Property Disposal; To Amend Section 29-9-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Veterans Affairs Board; revise powers and duties relating to the operation of the State Veterans Homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16 Approved by Governor
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-23SenateConferees Named Seymour,DeBar,Polk
2021-03-23HouseConferees Named Carpenter,Newman,Oliver
2021-03-23HouseConferees Named Carpenter,Newman,Stamps
2021-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-09SenateAmended
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-03-02SenateDR - TSDP: VM To AP
2021-02-17SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Appropriations
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To MA
2021-01-26HouseDR - TSDPCS: MA To AP
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Military Affairs;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2999Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3517Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/HB/HB0761.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0761IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0761CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0761PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0761SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/HB0761_S_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0370017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0640051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0850016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0850018.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback