MS HB632 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "all Fuels Act Of 2021"; To Provide That No Political Subdivision May Prohibit The Expansion, Connection Or Reconnection Of A Service Based Upon The Type Or Source Of Energy Provided To A Customer; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"All Fuels Act of 2021"; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Energy |