MS HB594 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-27-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Coastal Wetlands Protection Act To Define "ordinary High Water Mark" To Mean A Mark On The Shore Determined By The Department Staff, Established By Fluctuations In Water Level And Indicated By Physical And Biological Characteristics Including, But Not Limited To, Water Stains, Changes In The Character Of The Soil, Scour Lines, Presence Of Debris Lines, Changes In Plant Communities And Other Appropriate Means That Consider The Characteristics Of The Surrounding Area; To Revise The Definition Of "coastal Wetlands" To Mean All Publicly Owned Lands Subject To The Ebb And Flow Of The Tide, Which Are Below The Ordinary High Water Mark, All Publicly Owned Accretions Above The Ordinary High Water Mark And All Publicly Owned Submerged Water Bottoms Below The Ordinary High Water Mark And Includes The Flora And Fauna On The Wetlands And In The Wetlands; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coastal Wetlands Protection Act; revise definitions to include "ordinary high water mark".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Moran,Thompson,England |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Ladner,Felsher,Eure |
2021-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |