MS HB581 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "sexual Assault Response For College Students Act"; To Provide Certain Definitions For The Act; To Require All Higher Education Institutions To Adopt A Comprehensive Policy That Is Consistent With Federal And State Law Regarding The Institution's Response To Allegations Of Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, Dating Violence, Sexual Exploitation And Stalking; To List The Minimum Requirements To Be Included In Such Policy; To Require Each Higher Education Institution To Prominently Publish, Timely Update, And Have Easily Accessible On Its Official School Website Such Policy; To Require Each Higher Education Institution To Have Access To An On-campus Confidential Advisor To Provide Counseling, Mental Health Support And Physical Health Support To Complainants, Respondents, And Survivors; To Require The Higher Education Institution To Train All Employees, Student Employees And Persons With Supervising Authority Regarding Standards To Assist Any Student Who Alleges A Violation Of The Comprehensive Policy Described By This Act; To Require All Higher Education Institutions To Adopt Procedures To Resolve Complaints Of Alleged Violations Of Such Policy; And For Related Purposes.
Title
The Sexual Assault Response For College Students Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Cockerham [I] | Rep. Dana Underwood McLean [R] | Rep. Zakiya Summers [D] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |