MS HB572 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 3-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Governing Authorities Of A Municipality Or County To Declare Mardi Gras Day And Any One Other Day During The Year To Be Legal Holidays In Lieu Of Certain Other Legal Holidays; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legal Holidays; revise authority of cities and counties to designate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Banks, Shows, Byrd, Blackmon) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: MU To CA |
2013-01-30 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To MU |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Municipalities |