MS HB551 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Direct The Commissioner Of Insurance To Develop A Uniform Hospital Claims Form That Meets Certain Criteria; To Require Every Health Insurance Issuer That Provides Benefits For Hospital Services To Use And Accept Only The Uniform Hospital Claims Form Developed Under This Act For All Claims For Reimbursement Or Indemnification For The Cost Of Hospital Services Provided To An Insured; To Provide That A Person May Use The Uniform Hospital Claims Form To File A Claim With Any Health Insurance Issuer With Which The Person Is An Insured; To Amend Section 83-9-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform hospital claims form; Insurance Commissioner develop to use for all hospital services reimbursement claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2014-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-05 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-01-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Chism, Busby) |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed |
2014-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Insurance |