MS HB526 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Hunters To Wear Solid Unbroken Fluorescent Pink As An Alternative To Fluorescent Orange When Hunting Deer During Any Gun Season On Deer; To Amend Section 49-7-31.5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Hunters To Wear Solid Unbroken Fluorescent Pink As An Alternative To Fluorescent Orange When Hunting Wild Hogs During Any Open Gun Season On Deer; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting; authorize hunters to wear fluorescent pink as an alternative to fluorescent orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2024-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed |
2024-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |