MS HB512 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Powers And Duties Of The Agents And Inspectors Of The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Of The Department Of Revenue, To Delete The Provision That Provides That Nothing In That Section Shall Be Construed As Granting Agents And Inspectors Of The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Of The Department Of Revenue General Police Powers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
ABC agents/inspectors; revise certain provisions regarding powers of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |