MS HB453 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-64.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commission On Marine Resources To Open Legal Shrimping Areas With A Shrimp Count Of Greater Than 68 Per Pound Under Certain Conditions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legal shrimping areas; authorize Commission on Marine Resources to exceed under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Died On Calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-04 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Marine Resources |