MS HB433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 7-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning And The Local Board Of Trustees Of A Community Or Junior College To Adopt Rules And Regulations For Institutions Under Their Governance For The Waiver Of Certification That Goods Or Services Have Been Received Or Performed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Universities & colleges; provide authority to prepay certain expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Hudson,Wilemon |
2014-03-13 | House | Conferees Named Mettetal,Holloway,Nelson |
2014-03-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2014-01-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-01-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-01-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Mettetal, Holloway) |
2014-01-24 | House | Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |