MS HB350 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Higher Education Service Corps Act Of 2010"; To Relieve The Critical Need For Tutoring And Mentoring Services In Public Schools Located In Areas Of High Poverty By Allowing College Students To Provide Such Services; To Provide That If Such Services Are Rendered, Then College Students May Be Awarded Scholarships Or Repayment Of Student Loans For Agreeing To Provide Tutoring And Mentoring Services; To Direct The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning And The State Board Of Education To Promulgate Rules Necessary For The Proper Administration Of This Act; To Require The Department Of Education And The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning To Jointly Prepare An Annual Report For The Legislature To Assess The Impact Of Tutoring And Mentoring Services By College Students In Public School Districts Located In High Poverty Areas; To Establish A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Known As The "mississippi Higher Education Service Corps Fund" For The Purpose Of Implementing This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Poverty; create "Mississippi Higher Education Service Corps Act of 2010."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-06 | Referred To Select Committee on Poverty |