MS HB300 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 21-23-8, 99-5-9, And 99-5-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide Bail Procedures For Municipal, County And Justice Courts, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bail procedures; bring forward provisions for purposes of amendment.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Newman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Amended |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 23 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 5 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 5 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |