MS HB286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Cemetery Owners To Disinter Dead Human Remains For Reinterment Or For Transportation From The Cemetery Pursuant To Written Instructions Of The Next Of Kin, Or Pursuant To A Final Order Of The Chancery Court In The County In Which The Cemetery Is Located, Or In Order To Correct An Error Made In The Original Interment Of The Remains Upon Notice; To Provide Immunity From Liability For Owners Of Cemeteries And Funeral Establishments And Their Employees, Officers And Directors For Claims Arising From The Disinterment And Reinterment Or Delivery Of Dead Human Remains Made In Accordance With This Act; To Amend Sections 41-37-25 And 41-39-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions.
Title
Cemeteries; authorize to disinter and reinter dead human remains for next of kin instructions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 37 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 39 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |