MS HB198 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-25-505, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Manner In Which Oil Severance Taxes Are Distributed To The State And The County In Which The Oil Was Produced; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oil severance tax; revise distribution between state and counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2014-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed |
2014-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |