MS HB1794 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From The "postsecondary Education Covid-19 Mitigation Relief Grant Fund" To The Department Of Finance And Administration For Purposes Of Administering The Grant Program Created To Provide The Reimbursement Of Eligible Expenses For The Mitigation Of The Impact Of Covid-19; Making An Appropriation From The "independent Schools' Covid-19 Assistance Grant Fund" To The Mississippi Development Authority To Administer The Grant Program Created To Provide The Reimbursement Of Eligible Expenses For The Mitigation Of The Impact Of Covid-19; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; IHL for postsecondary board to administer the "Postsecondary Education COVID-19 Mitigation Relief Grant Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-28 | House | Passed |
2020-06-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-27 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |