MS HB1790 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From The Mississippi Recovery Fund And From The Mississippi Nonprofit Museums Recovery Fund To The Department Of Finance And Administration For Tourism Recovery And Nonprofit Museum Recovery Purposes Related To The Public Health Emergency Due To Covid-19; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriations; DFA for tourism and nonprofit art museum recovery.
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] |
Rep. Carl Mickens [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Stephanie Foster [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Eure, Turner, Currie) |
2020-06-28 | House | Passed |
2020-06-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-26 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |