MS HB1736 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Humphreys County To Contribute Funds To Support The Humphreys County Dixie Youth Little League; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Humphreys County; authorize to contribute funds to Humphreys County Dixie Youth Little League.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-24 | Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-03-18 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-18 | Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-03-16 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |