MS HB1735 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Oxford, Mississippi, To Expand Its Water System Within A Certain Distance Outside The Corporate Limits Of The City Of Oxford To Provide Services Solely To The Punkin Water Association; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Oxford; authorize expansion of water system for a certain distance outside of city to serve Punkin Water Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2022-03-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |