MS HB1717 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Warren County, Mississippi, To Contract With The Department Of Corrections To Provide Correctional Services To Warren County For The Confinement Of Inmates Subject To The Jurisdiction Of Warren County Including Those Awaiting Transfer To Any Other Jurisdiction Or Facility; To Provide That It Shall Be Lawful For Such Facility To Be Located In Warren County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Warren County; authorize to contract with the Department of Corrections for regional correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2013-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |