MS HB1665 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Finance And Administration - Bureau Of Building, Grounds And Real Property Management For The Purpose Of Funding Construction And/or Repair And Renovation Projects At State Agencies, State Institutions Of Higher Learning And Community Colleges For The Fiscal Year 2023.
Title
Appropriation; DFA - Bureau of Building for projects at agencies, institutions and colleges.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Butler (36th) |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | Amended |
2022-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |