MS HB1662 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Harrison County To Conduct Hearings To Determine Whether Certain Property Within The County Is Blighted Property; To Require The Board Of Supervisors To Provide Notice To The Owners Of "blighted" Property; To Provide The Form And Manner Of The Notice; To Authorize The County To Charge The Actual Costs Of Correcting The Blighted Property; To Authorize The County To Assess Penalties Against The Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harrison County; authorize to clean blighted property.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] |
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |