MS HB1639 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Task Force On The Establishment Of A Mississippi Delta Regional Health Authority; To Provide For The Membership Of The Task Force; To Specify The Matters On Which The Task Force Shall Gather Information, Review, Study And Make Recommendations; To Provide For The Meetings And Funding Of The Task Force; To Assign The Task Force To The State Department Of Health For Administrative Purposes; To Provide That The Task Force Shall Make A Report Of Its Findings And Recommendations To The Legislature And The Governor By November 1, 2024, Including Any Recommended Legislation, At Which Time The Task Force Shall Be Dissolved; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Delta Regional Health Authority; create task force on the establishment of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2024-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Creekmore IV, Felsher) |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 46 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 13 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 7 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |