MS HB163 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Alternative Sentencing Options For Juvenile Offenders With Certain Murder Convictions; To Bring Forward Sections 25-31-5 And 25-31-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For District Attorneys And Criminal Investigators; To Bring Forward Sections 9-7-5, 9-7-7, 9-7-9, 9-7-11, 9-7-13, 9-7-14, 9-7-15, 9-7-17, 9-7-19, 9-7-20, 9-7-21, 9-7-23, 9-7-25, 9-7-29, 9-7-27, 9-7-30, 9-7-31, 9-7-32, 9-7-33, 9-7-34, 9-7-35, 9-7-37, 9-7-39, 9-7-41, 9-7-42, 9-7-43, 9-7-44, 9-7-45, 9-7-46, 9-7-47, 9-7-49, 9-7-51, 9-7-53, 9-7-54, 9-7-55, 9-7-57, 9-7-63 And 9-7-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The First Through Twenty-third Judicial Districts, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial districts; create Twenty-fourth Circuit Court.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Failed (Y: 57 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bain, Sanford, Roberson) |
2021-02-09 | House | Failed |
2021-02-09 | House | Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee Substitute Tabled |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 31 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 31 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 3 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |