MS HB1590 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From General Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Public Service Commission For The Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Public Service Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Wilemon,Michel |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Bennett |
2018-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations |