MS HB1548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That Daylight Saving Time Shall Be The Year-round Standard Time Of The State Of Mississippi If Federal Law Is Amended To Authorize States To Observe Daylight Saving Time Year-round And All Contiguous States Observe The Same; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daylight saving time; observe year-round if the federal law is amended to allow it.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Rules
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Interstate Cooperation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback