MS HB1528 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 816, Local And Private Laws Of 1991, As Last Amended By Chapter 932, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2021, To July 1, 2025, On The Provision Of Law That Establishes The Washington County Convention And Visitors Committee And Authorizes A Tax On Hotels, Motels And Restaurants; To Revise The Composition Of The Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; extend repeal date on Washington County Convention and Visitors Committee and the tourism tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/HB/HB1528.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1500-1599/HB1528IN.htm |