MS HB1525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 938, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 981, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 960, Local And Private Laws Of 2001, As Amended By Chapter 923, Local And Private Laws Of 2018, To Extend The Repealer From July 1, 2022, To July 1, 2026, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Richland, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Sales Of Bars And Restaurants In An Amount Not To Exceed Two Percent For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Promotion Of Tourism, Parks And Recreation Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Richland; extend repealer on bar and restaurant tourism tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |