MS HB1517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 435, Local And Private Laws Of 1944, As Last Amended By Chapter 926, Local And Private Laws Of 2009, To Remove The Existing Restriction On The Authority Of The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Biloxi, Mississippi, To Provide For Annual Cost-of-living Increases For Current And Future Retired Members Of The General Municipal Employees' Retirement System Of The City Of Biloxi, And Beneficiaries Thereof, Which Limits Such Increases To A Maximum Cumulative Percentage Of Sixty-four And Four-tenths Percent Of The Annual Retirement Allowance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Biloxi; remove restriction to provide annual cost-of-living increases for members of the city's general municipal employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To AP |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Appropriations |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-02 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To LP |
2020-03-10 | House | DR - TSDP: LP To AP |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Appropriations |