MS HB1457 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That When An Amendment To The Mississippi Constitution Of 1890 Is Proposed Under The State Voter Initiative Procedure, The Secretary Of State, With The Approval Of The Attorney General, May Make Certain Nonsubstantive Clerical Or Technical Corrections In The Section Number Reference Or Designation Of The Proposed Constitutional Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Constitution; S.O.S. may make nonsubstantive correction in section number designation in proposed voter initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-11 | Passed | |
2011-02-11 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-11 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Perkins, Warren, Clark) | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-08 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-08 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 50 |