MS HB1434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, To Make An Annual Contribution To Mid-state Opportunity, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tallahatchie County; authorize contributions to Mid-State Opportunity, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |