MS HB1417 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Conferees Named Harkins,Kirby,Polk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Conferees Named Harkins,Kirby,Polk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-117-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Radius In Which A Health Care Industry Facility Must Be Located From Certain Facilities In Order For The Area To Qualify For Certification As A Health Care Industry Zone By The Mississippi Development Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health care industry zone; expand radius for location of certain facilities for certification by MDA as.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Eure [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Kirby,Polk |
2024-04-17 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Zuber |
2024-04-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |