MS HB1371 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Director Of The Driver Services Division, Director Of The Driver License Examining Bureau And Supervising Examiners Must Meet Qualifications Set By The State Personnel Board For The Position; To Prohibit Active-service Highway Patrol Officers From Serving In The Driver License Examining Bureau; To Amend Section 63-1-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Driver's License Kiosks Shall Be Equipped With Printers On Location At All Kiosk Locations In The State For The Purpose Of Printing All Kiosk Documents, Cards And Other Printouts On Site; To Provide That At Each Driver's License Location In The State, There Shall Be Location Signs Prominently Displayed Providing For Required Information For The Various Licenses, Cards And Other Services; To Provide That On The Driver Services Division's Website, There Shall Be Tutorial Videos Linked To Online Procedures To Help Clearly Illustrate How To Use The Website; To Provide That On The Driver Services Division's Website, The "wait Anywhere Appointment," Or Its Equivalent Or Successor Program, Shall Be Made Available To Use For All Driver's License Locations In The State; To Amend Sections 63-1-35 And 45-35-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Develop And Implement An Electronic Format For Driver's Licenses, Driving Permits And Identification Cards As An Option For License Holders, Permit Holders And Card Holders; To Amend Section 63-1-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Accept The Certification Of Successful Completion Of An Individual's Training In The Knowledge And Skills Needed For The Proper And Safe Operation Of A Motor Vehicle From A Driver Education And Training Program At A Secondary School That Meets The Standards Of The State Board Of Education, In Lieu Of The Department Administering The Examination Of The Individual For The Purpose Of Obtaining A Driver's License; To Specify Who May Be Employed As Instructors In Such Secondary School Programs; To Direct The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Develop An Affidavit Whereby A Parent, Guardian Or Teacher May Certify That He Or She Has Witnessed A Student Operate A Motor Vehicle For At Least 50 Hours And Attest To Their Proficiency In The Proper And Safe Operation Of A Motor Vehicle And Provide That The Department Of Public Safety Shall Accept Such In Lieu Of A Skills Test By The Department; To Amend Section 63-1-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A $10.00 Reduction Of A Driver's License Fee In Certain Instances Where The Person Does Not Receive Their License After A 2.5 Hour Wait; To Amend Section 63-1-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Email And Text Notification Of The Upcoming Expiration Of A Driver's License At Least Thirty Days Prior To The Expiration Date; To Amend Section 63-1-208, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Authorize Certain Third Parties To Administer The Knowledge And Skills Test Required For A Commercial Driver's License; To Amend Section 63-1-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Cdl Renewals Shall Be Available To Be Performed Online Except For In Certain Circumstances; To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Upload Medical Card Information And Notify License Holders Within A Certain Amount Of Time; To Amend Sections 45-33-25, 45-33-27, 45-33-29, 45-33-31, 45-33-33 And 45-33-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The Location For Mandatory Personal Appearances Of Registered Sex Offenders From The Driver's License Station To A Facility Designated By The Department Of Public Safety, Or In A Manner Of The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety's Choosing, Including By Electronic Means; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DPS division of driver services; make various revisions regarding.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Busby [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Parks,DeLano |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Mangold |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-02-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Transportation |