MS HB1369 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-151-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "average Daily Membership (adm)" For Purposes Of The Mississippi Adequate Education Program; To Amend Section 37-151-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Determination Of The Basic Adequate Education Program Cost For Each School District Based On Student Average Daily Membership With Certain Exceptions; To Provide For Student Counts By The State Auditor; To Revise The Definition Of The Terms "minimum School Term" And "average Daily Attendance" As Such Terms Are Used For Determining Allocations To School Districts Under The Adequate Education Program; To Amend Sections 37-151-85, 37-151-97 And 37-151-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 37-13-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Attendance Requirement That A Compulsory-school-age Child Who Is Absent More Than 37% Of The Instructional Day Must Be Considered Absent For The Entire Day; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MAEP; determine cost of using Average Daily Membership (ADM) in lieu of ADA with 90% threshold attendance trigger.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Polk,Boyd |
2023-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Owen |
2023-03-23 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 13 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |