MS HB1363 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 57-46-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Use Of The Mississippi Railroad Improvements Fund To Provide That Grants From The Fund Shall Be Available Specifically To Short Line Railroads; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Railroad Improvements Fund; revise to provide that grants are for short line railroads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Chassaniol
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Busby,Steverson,Massengill
2019-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Transportation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback