MS HB1359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Regular Redetermination Of Medicaid Eligibility Shall Be Available By Mail; To Provide That The Division Shall Not Be Authorized To Require Recipients To Have An In-person, Face-to-face Meeting Or Interview For Redetermination Of Eligibility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Medicaid; redetermination of eligibility for shall be available by mail, and prohibit face-to-face requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-08 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baker (74th), Dedeaux, Johnson) | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Medicaid |