MS HB1351 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 6 Through 20, Chapter 521, Laws Of 1995, As Last Amended By Section 25, Chapter 492, Laws Of 2020, To Increase From $36,843,000.00 To $40,043,000.00 The Amount Of State General Obligation Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For The Local Governments And Rural Water Systems Improvements Revolving Loan Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; increase amount that may be issued for the Local Governments and Rural Water Systems Improvements Revolving Loan Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Tabled |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |