MS HB1346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Guntown, Mississippi, To Allow The Operation Of Low-speed Vehicles And Golf Carts On Certain Public Roads And Streets Within The City; To Require Individuals Operating A Golf Cart Or Low-speed Vehicle To Have A Valid Driver's License And Proof Of Insurance; To Require Low-speed Vehicles And Golf Carts To Be Registered With The City; To Authorize The City To Charge A Registration Fee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Guntown; authorize use of low-speed vehicles and golf carts on certain public streets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2021-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |