MS HB1322 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-3-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Board Of Education To Recommend Children Entering First Grade To Have A Face-to-face Comprehensive Eye Examination If The Child's Initial Eye Screening Indicates The Need; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eye examinations; require SBE to recommend for first grade students whose initial screening indicates need for comprehensive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Approved by Governor
2019-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-07SenatePassed
2019-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Education
2019-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-31HouseDR - TSDPCS: PH To ED
2019-01-31HouseDR - TSDPCS: ED To PH
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Education;Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback